Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Health Officers - Removal - Process
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Bhandari, Carr, Hill, Kerr, Landis, and R. Lewis
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 53
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law providing that a health officer serves at the pleasure of the Secretary of Health and the governing body of the county; establishing notice and hearing requirements related to a removal of a health officer from office; and prohibiting a health officer who appeals a certain decision of the Secretary from carrying out the duties of health officer while the appeal is pending.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Health Officers - Removal - Grounds and Process
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {503926/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-91)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {533121/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (38-91)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Health Officers - Removal - Grounds and Process
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-36)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463124/1
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-37)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Local Health Officers - Removal - Grounds and Process
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Overridden (97-41)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Overridden (30-13)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 53
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Local Health Officers - Removal - Process
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Local Health Officers - Removal - Grounds and Process
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {923723/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Floor Amendment {503926/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-91) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Floor Amendment {533121/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (38-91) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Health Officers - Removal - Grounds and Process
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Third Reading Passed (95-36) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {463124/1 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {463124/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-37) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Local Health Officers - Removal - Grounds and Process
Post Passage 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Overridden (97-41) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Overridden (30-13) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 53
Text - Chapter - Local Health Officers - Removal - Process
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page