Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Buckel, Luedtke, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Long, Ali, and C. Howard
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the principal of a public school to select any employee to administer certain assessments, under certain circumstances; and requiring a local superintendent to review and approve a principal's employee selection for administering a certain assessment before the assessment is administered.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0562
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {295764/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {295764/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Text - Chapter - Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School Employees
(   7-203.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page