Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegates Munoz and Toles
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup to study issues and factors potentially contributing to recruitment challenges and the decline in police officer retention statewide; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 30, 2025.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0380
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0308 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {563328/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 9:01 AM
Click to return on the top page