Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Reporting Agencies - Records of Criminal Proceedings - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Healey
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting consumer reporting agencies from including in a consumer report certain records relating to a criminal proceeding involving a consumer; and prohibiting consumer reporting agencies from relying on information in certain criminal proceedings concerning the consumer to make a determination of the creditworthiness of a consumer.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0994 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-24)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Records of Criminal Proceedings - Prohibition
House 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Records of Criminal Proceedings - Prohibition
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (114-24) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Finance 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2024 8:20 AM
Click to return on the top page