Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant in a certain consumer contract from shortening the period of time during which a consumer may file a civil action at law against a merchant; providing that certain provisions of a consumer contract are void and unenforceable; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0837
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523695/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-8)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {523695/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (129-8) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page