Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians – Sunset Evaluation and Termination
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, McIntosh, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Bagnall, Barron, Carr, Charles, Cullison, Hill, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the date of the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the State Board of Physicians and certain allied health advisory committees to June 1, 2020; altering the date of the evaluation provision relating to the State Board of Physicians under the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) from 2021 to 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Sunset Evaluation and Performance Audit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486388/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Sunset Evaluation and Performance Audit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974534/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Physicians – Sunset Evaluation and Termination
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Physicians – Sunset Evaluation and Termination
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Sunset Evaluation and Performance Audit
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {486388/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Sunset Evaluation and Performance Audit
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {974534/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Physicians – Sunset Evaluation and Termination
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Text - Chapter - State Board of Physicians – Sunset Evaluation and Termination
(   14-201, 14-5A-05, 14-5A-25, 14-5B-05, 14-5B-21, 14-5C-05, 14-5C-25, 14-5D-04, 14-5D-20, 14-5E-05, 14-5E-25, 14-5F-06, 14-5F-32, 14-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page