Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsored by
Delegate Howard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in the business of making or soliciting a sales-based financing transaction unless the person is licensed by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; requiring an applicant for a license to have $20,000 in available liquid assets and to have demonstrated a sufficient level of responsibility to command public confidence and warrant faith in the honest operation of the business; requiring the Commissioner to investigate and ensure that each applicant meets certain qualifications; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0532
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   11-610,   12-1101 through 12-1124 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page