Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Air Quality
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Belcastro, Bhandari, Boteler, C. Branch, Brooks, Charkoudian, Charles, Ebersole, Forbes, Guyton, Henson, R. Jones, Kipke, Korman, Landis, Love, Proctor, Ruth, Watson, Williams, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to adopt regulations to set minimal standards for air quality standards by August 1, 2023; requiring each county board of education to utilize the services of a qualified indoor air quality investigator to conduct any indoor air quality tests to be conducted in a public school in the county; and requiring a county board, on receipt of a request by a member of the public for the results of an indoor air quality test to provide the results to a member of the public in a certain manner.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0576
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Air Quality Testing - Posting Online
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Air Quality
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Air Quality Testing - Posting Online
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {353729/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Air Quality
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-447.2 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:23 PM
Click to return on the top page