Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Korman, Folden, Jalisi, and McMillan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting vehicle traffic from entering certain intersections against certain traffic signals if the vehicle is unable to safely and completely proceed through the intersection; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; and prohibiting a police officer from issuing a citation for a violation of the Act unless certain conditions are met.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0237 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {510018/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Glass) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {103825/1 (Delegate Glass) Rejected
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-11)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {510018/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Glass) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Floor Amendment {103825/1 (Delegate Glass) Rejected 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (126-11) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   21-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page