Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Charkoudian, and Cain
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "student data" for purposes of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System to include juvenile delinquency and elementary and secondary school disciplinary records; adding the Department of Juvenile Services to the entities required to provide data to the Maryland Longitudinal Data System; adding the Secretary of Juvenile Services or the Secretary's designee to the Governing Board of the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {905765/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-18)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494833/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-21)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {905765/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (121-18) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {494833/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (114-21) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Text - Chapter - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student Data and Governing Board
(   24-701, 24-703, 24-704, 24-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page