Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve and Stein
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain exemption to the requirement to report certain measures and indicators in a certain annual report; requiring a county or municipal corporation to submit an annual report to the Department of Planning that contains certain information on residential building permits issued in the previous calendar year; and requiring the Department of Planning to submit an annual report to the General Assembly on the development of housing in the State during the previous calendar year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing
House 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/5/2022 9:36 AM
Click to return on the top page