Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Potential Income, Voluntary Impoverishment, and No Support Order
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais and Malone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the court to decline to establish a child support order under certain circumstances; specifying that the fact that a parent meets or ceases to meet certain criteria shall constitute a material change of circumstance for the purpose of modification of a child support award; requiring the court to take certain actions if there is a dispute as to whether a parent is voluntarily impoverished; applying the Act only to cases filed on or after October 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0762
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Support - Potential Income, Voluntary Impoverishment, and No Support Order
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Support - Potential Income, Voluntary Impoverishment, and No Support Order
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Hearing canceled
(   12-201, 12-202, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page