Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Release
Sponsored by
Delegate Thiam
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Division of Correction and a local correctional facility to establish, through a memorandum of understanding, a rate of reimbursement for an inmate sentenced to the Division and confined in a local correctional facility under certain circumstances; requiring the Division to transport an inmate from a certain correctional facility to a local correctional facility of the inmate's last known residence before incarceration before the inmate is scheduled to be released from a State correctional facility.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmate Release
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmate Release
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/24/2022 9:49 AM
Click to return on the top page