Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Phillips and White Holland
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority to conduct a certain feasibility study for developing, establishing, and operating a sports tourism facility at Reisterstown Regional Park in northwest Baltimore County; requiring the Authority to consult with certain governments, stakeholders and entities; and requiring the Authority to submit a final report of its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly by July 1, 2025.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0804
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2024 8:50 AM
Click to return on the top page