Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges’ Retirement System – Purchase of Service Credit – Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing obsolete provisions of law that authorize the purchase of service credit in the Judges' Retirement System for certain service as a magistrate before July 1, 1975, or for service as a member of the Workers' Compensation Commission before July 1, 1977.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Judges’ Retirement System – Purchase of Service Credit – Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Judges’ Retirement System – Purchase of Service Credit – Repeal
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/19/2022 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page