Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the dates used to determine the eligibility of members of the State Retirement and Pension System for COVID-19-related death benefits.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0409
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {503623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-34)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {503623/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (99-34) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page