Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Wilkins, Carr, K. Young, Patterson, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections, in collaboration with the local boards of elections, to conduct a risk-limiting audit after each statewide election; authorizing, rather than requiring, the State Board, in collaboration with the local boards, to conduct an automated software audit after a statewide election; and requiring the State Board, in collaboration with certain local boards, to conduct pilot risk-limiting audits after the November 2022 statewide general election.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0742
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0759 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {373928/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/25/2022 1:07 PM
Click to return on the top page