Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an electric low speed scooter is considered to be a bicycle for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; providing that an electric low speed scooter is not a motorized minibike, motor scooter, or motor vehicle for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing that the operator of an electric low speed scooter may ride by standing on a certain platform; providing that provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law do not prevent a local authority from regulating, in its jurisdiction, the operation of bicycles; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0770
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640715/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988678/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {640715/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {988678/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
(   11-104, 11-117.2, 11-134.4, 11-134.5, 11-135, 11-154.1, 21-1202, 21-1203, 25-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page