Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegates West and Lierman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting specified persons from specified requirements under the Maryland Trust Act to provide specified notice and specified information to themselves.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0792
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text - Chapter - Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
(   14.5-109, 14.5-813 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page