Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Interscholastic and Intramural Teams and Sports – Designation Based on Biological Sex (Save Women’s Sports Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga, Arikan, Boteler, Chisholm, M. Fisher, Grammer, Kittleman, Krebs, Mangione, McComas, Morgan, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Thiam, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain interscholastic and intramural athletic teams or sports sponsored by certain schools to be expressly designated based on biological sex; prohibiting certain entities from taking certain adverse actions against a school or county board of education for maintaining separate interscholastic and intramural athletic teams and sports for students of the female sex; and providing that certain individuals have the right to bring a civil action under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education – Interscholastic and Intramural Teams and Sports – Designation Based on Biological Sex (Save Women’s Sports Act)
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   7-129 )
Last Updated: 2/26/2022 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page