Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Buckel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified costs incurred by the holder of a tax sale certificate shall be reimbursed on redemption of the property; requiring specified payments for reimbursement to be made to the attorney for a holder of a certificate of sale or the holder of a certificate of sale and not the collector; providing that the holder of a tax sale certificate shall be reimbursed $500 for attorney's fees if an action to foreclose the right of redemption has not been filed and establishing that amount as reasonable; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1144 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
(   14-833, 14-843 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page