Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Missing Children in Out-of-Home Placements - Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Carr, Chang, Charles, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Henson, Howell, Landis, Love, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, and Solomon
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services and local departments of social services, immediately after a discovery that a child in an out-of-home placement is missing, to report to local law enforcement agencies any information the Department or a local department of social services has or reasonably could obtain that would assist in locating the missing child.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Missing Individuals - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Missing Individuals - Reporting
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {613725/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Missing Children in Out-of-Home Placements - Reporting
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/23/2022 4:57 PM
Click to return on the top page