Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Procurement - Contracts - Term Length and Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Landis, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a procurement officer to limit the contract term for an emergency procurement to 12 months; prohibiting a procurement officer from renewing a contract for an emergency procurement except under certain circumstances; and requiring a procurement officer to use certain procurement methods to award a new contract under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency Procurement - Contracts - Term Length and Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Emergency Procurement - Contracts - Term Length and Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Emergency Procurement - Contracts - Term Length and Renewal
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {273424/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Procurement - Contracts - Term Length and Renewal
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/5/2022 4:05 PM
Click to return on the top page