Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Award of Reasonable and Necessary Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, at any point in a judicial proceeding under the Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act, the court to order either party to pay the other party an amount for the reasonable and necessary expense of prosecuting or defending the proceeding; requiring the court to consider certain issues before ordering payment under the Act; authorizing the court to make a certain award under certain circumstances; providing for a certain reimbursement; authorizing the court to make a certain order; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {286882/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Award of Reasonable and Necessary Expenses
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {286882/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Award of Reasonable and Necessary Expenses
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Award of Reasonable and Necessary Expenses
(   13-301, 13-314, 13-317, 13-318, 13-319, 13-323.1, 13-324 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page