Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Schmidt and Simmons
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the time period within which a court may prohibit a person convicted under certain circumstances of operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol from operating a vessel on the waters of the State; requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in coordination with the Natural Resources Police Force, to establish and maintain a database of persons prohibited from operating a vessel on the waters of the State due to a certain conviction for operating a vessel while under the influence of alcohol; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0740
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703624/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law)
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {703624/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law)
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Referred Rules 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:48 AM
Click to return on the top page