Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke and Bromwell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to conduct a study to assess the need in the State for short-term medical insurance offered by nonadmitted insurers; establishing specified requirements for the study; requiring the Administration to solicit input from specified persons in conducting the study; requiring the Administration to submit a specified report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0380
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {856486/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {757272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Procurement From Nonadmitted Insurer
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {856486/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {757272/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page