Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Freedom to Read Act
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Jones, A. Jones, Atterbeary, Ebersole, Wilkins, Fair, Feldmark, Grossman, Mireku-North, Palakovich Carr, and Wu
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a State policy that local school systems operate their school library media programs consistent with certain standards; requiring each local school system to develop a policy and procedures to review objections to materials in a school library media program; prohibiting a county board of education from dismissing, demoting, suspending, disciplining, reassigning, transferring, or otherwise retaliating against certain school library media program personnel for performing their job duties consistent with certain standards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0738
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Freedom to Read Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Mangione) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {493622/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (37-90)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {123629/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (36-88)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {683725/1 (Delegate Schmidt) Rejected (35-88)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Freedom to Read Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-37)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Freedom to Read Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Freedom to Read Act
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {573520/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Mangione) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Floor Amendment {493622/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (37-90) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Floor Amendment {123629/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (36-88) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Floor Amendment {683725/1 (Delegate Schmidt) Rejected (35-88) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Freedom to Read Act
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (98-37) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments {783829/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (100-36) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Freedom to Read Act
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 7:53 AM
Click to return on the top page