Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support Administration - Suspension of Driver's License or Privilege to Drive for Arrears - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Anderson, Gibson, Sydnor, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting an obligor whose income is at or below 200% of the federal poverty level from having the obligor's driver's license or privilege to drive in the State suspended for being out of compliance with the most recent order of the court in making child support payments.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Child Support Administration - Suspension of Driver's License or Privilege to Drive for Arrears - Exemption
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page