Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Police Staffing Levels in Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Arentz, Buckel, Carozza, Cluster, Folden, Grammer, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Long, McComas, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Reilly, Rose, Szeliga, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Police Staffing Levels in Baltimore City; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters, and to report its findings and recommendations to the majority and minority leaders of both Houses of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018; and terminating the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Police Staffing Levels in Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force on Police Staffing Levels in Baltimore City
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page