Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Aid - Guaranteed Access Grants - Verification and Administration by Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, B. Barnes, Gaines, McIntosh, and Mosby
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain institutions of higher education to verify the eligibility of an applicant for, and on verification administer, Guaranteed Access Grants under the Delegate Howard P. Rawlings Program of Educational Excellence Awards under certain circumstances; requiring the Financial Aid Advisory Council in the Higher Education Commission to study a certain financial aid verification process and make recommendations to the Commission and participating institutions on the implementation of the Act by December 31, 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744168/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {374735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Financial Aid - Guaranteed Access Grants - Verification and Administration by Institutions of Higher Education
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {744168/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Aid - Guaranteed Access Grants - Verification and Administration by Institutions of Higher Education
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {374735/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Financial Aid - Guaranteed Access Grants - Verification and Administration by Institutions of Higher Education
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Text - Chapter - Financial Aid - Guaranteed Access Grants - Verification and Administration by Institutions of Higher Education
(   18-301, 18-303, 18-303.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page