Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Expert Witnesses - Letter of Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court from requiring a letter of exception for an individual to testify in a criminal proceeding as an expert witness if the individual is reviewing the data, opinion, interpretation, or conclusion of another expert witness or forensic laboratory and is not handling any physical evidence.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Forensic Analysis - Letter of Exception - Criminal Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Expert Witnesses - Letter of Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-3)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Forensic Analysis - Letter of Exception - Criminal Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {793520/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Expert Witnesses - Letter of Exception
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-3) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/3/2022 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page