Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a business that generated recyclable material to submit a recycling report to the county on or before March 1 each year; specifying the contents of the recycling report; establishing that a business that violates the Act is subject to a civil penalty not exceeding $50 for each day on which the violation exists; requiring, rather than authorizing, a county to require a certain property owner, manager, or tenant to report to the county on recycling activities in a certain manner.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0988 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page