Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting and Fishing - Recreational License Fees - Moratorium
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to waive certain annual hunting license fees for State residents for the 2022-2023 license year; requiring the Department to waive a certain portion of the annual fee for certain recreational fishing licenses that are effective during the period between August 1, 2022, and July 31, 2023, inclusive; and requiring the Department to rebate certain overpayments of annual recreational fishing license fees to the license holders.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hunting and Fishing - Recreational License Fees - Moratorium
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Hunting and Fishing - Recreational License Fees - Moratorium
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2022 9:36 AM
Click to return on the top page