Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Uninsured Employers' Fund and Subsequent Injury Fund - Amount of Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Uninsured Employers' Fund)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to June 30, 2022, the termination provision relating to the percentages of certain assessments imposed by the Workers' Compensation Commission payable to the Uninsured Employers' Fund and the Subsequent Injury Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Uninsured Employers' Fund and Subsequent Injury Fund - Amount of Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Sunset Extension
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:16 PM
Click to return on the top page