Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Carey, Cassilly, Glass, Hornberger, Impallaria, Krebs, Malone, McDonough, McKay, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Sophocleus, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of State Police to establish an alternative expiration date for a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun that coincides with the expiration of a license, certification, or commission for a specified private detective, specified security guard, or specified special police officer.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {242915/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {803121/2 (Senator Madaleno)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {803121/2 (Senator Madaleno) Withdrawn
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police Officers
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {242915/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police Officers
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Floor Amendment {803121/2 (Senator Madaleno) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {803121/2 (Senator Madaleno) Withdrawn 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text - Chapter - Handgun Permits - Alternative Expiration Date - Private Detectives, Security Guards, and Special Police Officers
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page