Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an institution of higher education, a related medical facility, or an affiliated biomedical research firm to file with the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission a registration to purchase medical cannabis for the purpose of conducting a bona fide research project relating to the medical uses, properties, or composition of cannabis; providing that a certain registration is valid until there is a change in a certain project or there is a withdrawal of the registration; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0858
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {536181/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {536181/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
(   13-3301, 13-3304.1, 13-3306, 13-3307, 13-3309, 13-3313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page