Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Scrutinized Entities - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Chisholm, Arikan, Buckel, Ciliberti, Fisher, Grammer, Hornberger, Kipke, Mangione, McComas, M. Morgan, Nawrocki, Schmidt, Szeliga, Tomlinson, Valentine, Wivell, Alston, Cullison, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, and Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an entity owned, operated, or controlled by the government of certain countries subject to an embargo under the International Traffic in Arms Regulations from participating in any procurement with the State, a local government in the State, a public instrumentality in the State, or any governmental unit in the State; requiring the Board of Public Works to make certain determinations and maintain and publish a certain list of scrutinized entities; preempting any local ordinance, rule, or regulation that conflicts with the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Scrutinized Entities - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement - Government of the People's Republic of China - Prohibition
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {703429/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - Scrutinized Entities - Prohibition
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
(   17-7A-01 through 17-7A-06 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:12 PM
Click to return on the top page