Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Jones, Allen, Bagnall, Lehman, J. Lewis, Pruski, and Schmidt
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship to make the scholarship applicable to all programs at institutions of higher education in the State; altering the maximum award available, when a scholarship should be credited, and to whom initial awards should be provided under the scholarship; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0691
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433724/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education – Firefighters and EMS Recruitment and Retention – Scholarship and Loan Repayment Assistance
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {433724/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Firefighters and EMS Recruitment and Retention - Scholarship
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {573620/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page