Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the voluntary resignation of an employee is a valid circumstance for voluntarily leaving work if the employee resigned due to the employer requiring that the employee, as a condition of continued employment, be vaccinated against COVID-19 and the employer fails to provide suitable other work that would not require that the employee be vaccinated against COVID-19; and prohibiting the refusal of an employee to be vaccinated against COVID-19 from being considered gross misconduct, aggravated misconduct, or misconduct.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page