Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Itemized Deductions and Personal Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegate Flanagan
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amounts allowed as deductions for certain exemptions under the Maryland income tax; allowing certain individuals to itemize deductions to compute Maryland taxable income; allowing an individual, under certain circumstances, to increase the amount of itemized deductions used to determine Maryland taxable income by a certain amount of real or personal property taxes paid by the individual; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Itemized Deductions and Personal Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Itemized Deductions and Personal Exemptions
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-211, 10-217, 10-218 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page