Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Modification to Peace Officer Transport Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a peace officer, when the peace officer has a petition for emergency evaluation of an individual, to transport the emergency evaluee to an emergency facility as designated by the Department, instead of to the nearest emergency facility.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Modification to Peace Officer Transport Requirement
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page