Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans – Use of Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees of the Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans to consider using minority business enterprises for investment advisor and fund manager services; requiring the Board to use the Office of State Procurement's website and the State's electronic procurement system to provide notice to potential providers; and requiring the Board, in consultation with a certain office, to identify entities that have been certified as minority business enterprises.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-20)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans – Use of Minority Business Enterprises
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513125/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans – Use of Minority Business Enterprises
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (117-20) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/31/2022 2:42 PM
Click to return on the top page