Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required Studies
Sponsored by
Delegates Rudolph and James
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to require an applicant for a specified water quality certification to fund a specified study to determine the impact that the transport of specified sediment behind the Conowingo Dam may have on the Chesapeake Bay and specified other waters; requiring the Department to require the applicant to fund a specified study on the costs and benefits of specified methods of managing specified sediment behind the Conowingo Dam; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page