Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Programs for Behavioral Health Professionals in Primary and Secondary Schools - Requirements and Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring public institutions of higher education with behavioral health programs to offer courses in a manner that maximizes the number and types of students who may participate and coordinate with other public institutions of higher education; and establishing the Behavioral Health Professionals in Schools Quality and Diversity Grant Program to assist in preparing students to provide behavioral health services and to aid students from historically underrepresented populations to become behavioral health professionals; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Programs for Behavioral Health Professionals in Primary and Secondary Schools - Requirements and Grant Program
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-134, 17-501 through 17-504 )
Last Updated: 3/11/2022 4:32 PM
Click to return on the top page