Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Edelson, and R. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to approve a license expansion to a noncontiguous property with a separate use permit issued by the City if a certain condition is met; authorizing the establishment and conversion of various alcoholic beverages licenses in the 46th alcoholic beverages district; extending for 1 year the expiration of an alcoholic beverages license issued for a certain area for the purposes of transferring the license to another owner at the same location; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0607
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 12:57 PM
Click to return on the top page