Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Definition - Administrative Function
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Health and Government Operations (Delegate Pendergrass)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excluding the administration of certain personnel matters from the definition of "administrative function" as it relates to the Open Meetings Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Definition - Administrative Function
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Definition - Administrative Function
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-101, 3-103 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page