Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Afzali, Aumann, Barron, Bromwell, Buckel, Carey, Carozza, Chang, Cluster, Corderman, Flanagan, Frick, Frush, Grammer, C. Howard, S. Howard, Kelly, Kittleman, Krebs, Krimm, Long, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McConkey, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Platt, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Vogt, West, Wivell, K. Young, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Saab, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before December 1, 2018, to identify a method for establishing a tip line through which a person may report an individual suspected of prescribing medication or overprescribing medication in violation of certain provisions of law; requiring, on or before July 1 each year, the Secretary of Health to examine the prescription and treatment history of individuals who suffered fatal overdoses involving opiates and other controlled substances and report the findings beginning July 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - "Pill Mill" Tip Line
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {966382/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - "Pill Mill" Tip Line
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {966382/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health – “Pill Mill” Tip Line and Overdose Report
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Reassigned to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose Report
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page