Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health and Health Insurance - Behavioral Health Services - Expansion (Behavioral Health System Modernization Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide reimbursement for certain behavioral health peer recovery, measurement-based care, and crisis response services; requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage and reimbursement for certain behavioral health services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0637
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Health and Health Insurance - Behavioral Health Services - Expansion (Behavioral Health System Modernization Act)
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
(   15-717, 15-857 )
Last Updated: 4/6/2022 2:06 PM
Click to return on the top page