Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegates Phillips, Atterbeary, Amprey, Bartlett, Crutchfield, Embry, Kaufman, Roberson, Simmons, Taylor, Toles, White Holland, Williams, Woods, Conaway, and Moon
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting firearm industry members from knowingly creating, maintaining, or contributing to a public nuisance through the sale, manufacture, distribution, importation, or marketing of a firearm-related product under certain circumstances; requiring a firearm industry member to establish and implement certain reasonable controls regarding the sale, manufacture, distribution, importation, marketing, possession, and use of certain firearm-related products; authorizing certain civil actions for violations of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0488
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0259 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {973929/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-95)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {933523/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-97)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-38)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (31-14)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (33-13)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {533721/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Floor Amendment {973929/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-95) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Floor Amendment {933523/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-97) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (94-38) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Referred Rules 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Adopted 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Second Reading Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (31-14) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (33-13) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-2301 through 3-2304 )
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:49 PM
Click to return on the top page