Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance – Campaign Finance Reports – Prohibition on Disclosure
Sponsored by
Delegates Kittleman and Boteler
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that campaign finance reports are not subject to public inspection under the Public Information Act and may not be disclosed to a person other than the State Board of Elections or a local board of elections except under certain circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Campaign Finance – Campaign Finance Reports – Prohibition on Disclosure
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing canceled
(   13-302 )
Last Updated: 3/12/2022 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page